US SB1996 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect human rights and enhance opportunities for LGBTQI people around the world, and for other purposes.
Title
Greater Leadership Overseas for the Benefit of Equality Act of 2021 GLOBE Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3800 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3485 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR900 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3485 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR900 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1996/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1996/BILLS-117s1996is.pdf |