US SB1992 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend the FAST Act to repeal a rescission of funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to amend the FAST Act to repeal a rescission of funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168.
2019-07-31SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-07-30SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-06-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB3612 (Related) 2019-07-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB2302 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 170.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback