US SB1976 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing Access to Care Act
Title
Increasing Access to Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6050 (Same As) 2018-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
HR1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6937 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
HR1011 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6937 (Related) 2018-09-27 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1976/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1976/BILLS-115s1976is.pdf |