US SB1974 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ultralight Aircraft Smuggling Prevention Act of 2011 - Amends the Tariff Act of 1930 with respect to aviation smuggling to extend its coverage of aircraft to: (1) any contrivance invented, used, or designed to navigate, or fly in, the air; and (2) ultralight vehicles. Subjects attempts or conspiracies to commit aviation smuggling to specified criminal penalties. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary of Defense (DOD) should continue the broad program of cooperation with the Secretary of Homeland Security to identify DOD equipment, technology, and expertise that could be leveraged by Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to fulfill its missions. Urges DOD especially to ensure that DHS can identify DOD equipment and technology that could also be used by the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to combat illicit trafficking across the international borders between the United States and Mexico and the United States and Canada, including any that could be used to detect and track the illicit use of ultralight aircraft.
Title
Ultralight Aircraft Smuggling Prevention Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2011-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2011-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8466-8467; text as passed Senate: CR S8466-8467) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1507 (Related) 2011-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB803 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1485 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5260)
HB3801 (Related) 2012-02-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-93.
SB803 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1485 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5260)
HB3801 (Related) 2012-02-10 - Became Public Law No: 112-93.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Crime and law enforcement
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Latin America
Mexico
Military civil functions
Smuggling and trafficking
Border security and unlawful immigration
Canada
Crime and law enforcement
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Latin America
Mexico
Military civil functions
Smuggling and trafficking