US SB1945 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the long-term improvement of Historically Black Colleges and Universities, and for other purposes.
Title
IGNITE HBCU Excellence Act Institutional Grants for New Infrastructure, Technology, and Education for HBCU Excellence Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3294 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB6893 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8803 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB6893 (Related) 2022-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8803 (Related) 2022-09-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1945/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1945/BILLS-117s1945is.pdf |