US SB1943 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shiloh National Military Park Boundary Adjustment and Parker's Crossroads Battlefield Designation Act (Sec. 3) This bill modifies the boundary of Shiloh National Military Park, located in Tennessee and Mississippi, to include the following areas: (1) Fallen Timbers Battlefield, (2) Russell House Battlefield, and (3) Davis Bridge Battlefield. The Department of the Interior may acquire lands by donation, purchase from willing sellers, or exchange. (Sec. 4) The bill establishes Parker's Crossroads Battlefield in Tennessee as an affiliated area of the National Park System. The city of Parkers Crossroads and the Tennessee Historical Commission shall jointly be the management entity for the affiliated area. Interior may furnish technical assistance and enter into cooperative agreements with the management entity for financial assistance with marketing, interpretation, and preservation of the affiliated area. Interior shall develop a general management plan for the affiliated area.
Title
Shiloh National Military Park Boundary Adjustment and Parker's Crossroads Battlefield Designation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 594. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 114-321. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB87 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Land transfers
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee