US SB1941 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-219.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-219.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to standardize the use of core-based statistical area designations across Federal programs, to allow between 120 and 180 days for public comment on any proposed change to such designations, and to report on the scientific basis and estimated impact to Federal programs for any proposed change to such designations, and for other purposes.
Title
MAPS Act of 2021 Metropolitan Areas Protection and Standardization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-219. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8483-8484) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1941. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8483-8485) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-05-31 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-05-31 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2735-2736; text: CR S2735-2736) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-98. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |