US SB1931 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Western Area Power Administration Transparency Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Western Area Power Administration Transparency Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
2019-10-23SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-142.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-06-20SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4444 (Related) 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback