US SB1917 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (CISA) to study the cybersecurity risks facing elementary and secondary schools and develop recommendations that include cybersecurity guidelines designed to assist schools in facing those risks. The use of such recommendations shall be voluntary. The study must evaluate the challenges that schools face in securing (1) information systems owned, leased, or relied upon by those schools; and (2) sensitive student and employee records. Further, the bill requires CISA to (1) develop an online training toolkit designed for school officials; and (2) make available on the Department of Homeland Security website the study's findings, the cybersecurity guidelines, and the toolkit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Cybersecurity Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-47.
2021-10-08SenateSigned by President.
2021-10-05SenatePresented to President.
2021-09-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-09-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5538)
2021-09-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1917.
2021-09-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5538-5539)
2021-09-29HouseMr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-08-13HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-08-13HouseReceived in the House.
2021-08-10SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-08-09SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6189-6190; text: CR S6189-6190)
2021-07-26SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 107.
2021-07-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-32.
2021-07-14SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-05-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB4691 (Same As) 2021-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 87.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback