US SB189 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Scott National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act This bill allows the Department of the Interior to acquire by purchase with appropriated funds, by donation (as under current law), or by exchange the lands and interests in land, together with buildings and improvements, known as Fort Scott in the city of Fort Scott in Bourbon County, Kansas. The proviso that the buildings so acquired shall not include the structure known as "Lunette Blair" is repealed. The boundary of the Fort Scott National Historic Site in Kansas shall be modified as generally depicted on the map referred to as "Fort Scott National Historic Site Proposed Boundary Modification," dated February 2016.
Title
Fort Scott National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-37. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Related) 2017-07-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 171.