US SB1883 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve the prohibitions on money laundering, and for other purposes.
Title
Combating Money Laundering, Terrorist Financing, and Counterfeiting Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2144 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business records
Consumer credit
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Currency
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Smuggling and trafficking
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Business records
Consumer credit
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Currency
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement officers
Smuggling and trafficking
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers