US SB1880 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Federal Trade Commission to submit to Congress a report on unfair or deceptive acts or practices targeted at Indian Tribes or members of Indian Tribes, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Indian Tribes from Scams Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-112. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 215. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1762 (Related) 2021-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1897 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1897 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.