US SB1869 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Whistleblower Protection Coordination Act
Title
Whistleblower Protection Coordination Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-192. |
2018-06-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-06-14 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-07 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4870-4871) |
2018-06-07 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4870-4871) |
2018-06-07 | House | Mr. Blum asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2018-03-15 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-03-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1771) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.2211 Amendment SA 2211 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | S.Amdt.2211 Amendment SA 2211 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S1771; text: CR S1771) To modify the repeal of sunset provision. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1770-1771) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286. |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 115-196. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4043 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Merit Systems Protection Board
Office of Special Counsel
Congressional oversight
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Merit Systems Protection Board
Office of Special Counsel