US SB1862 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2017 This bill amends the Trafficking Victims Protection Act of 2000 to modify: (1) the criteria for determining whether countries are meeting the minimum standards for the elimination of human trafficking, and (2) actions to be taken against countries that fail to meet such standards. The U.S. Agency for International Development shall incorporate child protection and anti-trafficking strategies into the development strategy for each country on the special watch list. The bill sets forth child soldier protection provisions. The U.S. Executive Director of each multilateral development bank shall initiate discussions to develop anti-human trafficking provisions in project development, procurement, and evaluation policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 623.
2018-10-05SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-09-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB1848 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.

Subjects

Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Labor standards
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Multilateral development programs
Organized crime
Public-private cooperation
Sex offenses
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback