US SB1859 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthcare Tax Relief Act This bill amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to delay the imposition of an annual fee on health insurance providers until after December 31, 2018.
Title
Healthcare Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1978 (Related) 2017-10-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4831 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4831 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1859/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1859/BILLS-115s1859is.pdf |