US SB1853 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies policies and procedures related to information sharing, reporting, and investigating cases of missing, unidentified, or murdered Indians. Among other elements, the bill requires the Department of Justice to share information, after receiving certain permission, with the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System (NamUs) on missing persons, unclaimed remains, and unidentified remains; ensure that technical assistance and training are provided to the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) and tribal law enforcement agencies to utilize the National Crime Information Center (NCIC) and other national databases; establish the Tribal Civil and Criminal Information Access Program to enhance the ability of tribal governments to access, enter information into, and obtain information from federal criminal information databases; establish a grant program for specified entities (e.g., tribes) to implement changes to enhance their responses to missing person cases and death investigations of interest to tribes; and work with the Department of Health and Human Services to ensure that federal training resources and culturally appropriate mental health and wellness programs are available to tribal and BIA law enforcement officers experiencing occupational stress. The bill expands access to (1) the national crime information database for NamUs, and (2) the NCIC for each tribal justice official. Finally, the Department of the Interior must establish a five-year demonstration program for the purpose of conducting or adjudicating personnel background investigations for applicants for law enforcement positions in the BIA.
Title
BADGES for Native Communities Act Bridging Agency Data Gaps and Ensuring Safety for Native Communities Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 476. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-230. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4289 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
SB2920 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 308.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of the Interior
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal-Indian relations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Minority health
Missing persons
Native Americans
Personnel records
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Department of the Interior
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal-Indian relations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Minority health
Missing persons
Native Americans
Personnel records
State and local government operations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health