US SB1846 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for collaboration between the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and state, local, tribal, and territorial governments, as well as corporations, associations, and the general public, regarding cybersecurity. The bill also provides for collaboration with foreign, as well as domestic, governmental agencies or entities, or corporations or associations. The bill expands DHS responsibilities through grants and cooperative agreements, including provision of assistance and education related to cyber threat indicators, defensive measures and cybersecurity technologies, cybersecurity risks, incidents, analysis, and warnings. The bill requires the National Cybersecurity and Communications Integration Center to coordinate with entities such as the Multi-State Information Sharing and Analysis Center to (1) conduct exercises, (2) provide operational and technical cybersecurity training, and (3) promote cybersecurity education and awareness. DHS may establish an initiative to enhance efforts to deploy technical or analytic capabilities or services that utilize classified cyber threat indicators or intelligence to detect or prevent malicious network traffic on unclassified non-federal information systems.
Title
State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-11-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.1252 Amendment SA 1252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.1252 Amendment SA 1252 proposed by Senator Fischer for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S6769-6770; text: CR S6769-6770) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | The committee amendment withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S6769) |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6768-6770; text: CR S6768-6769) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-90. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5394 (Related) 2020-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency management
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency management
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Technology assessment