US SB1830 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and modifies provisions related to U.S. international energy strategy. Applications to export natural gas to North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) member countries, Japan, and certain other countries shall be granted on an expedited basis without modification or delay. The Department of State shall report to Congress on a strategy to enhance the energy security of NATO member countries and increase U.S. energy exports to such countries.
Title
Energy Security Cooperation with Allied Partners in Europe Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7751 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Alliances
Asia
Collective security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Free trade and trade barriers
Germany
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Japan
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Russia
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Visas and passports
Asia
Collective security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Free trade and trade barriers
Germany
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Japan
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Russia
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Visas and passports