US SB1829 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the issuance of exempt facility bonds for qualified carbon dioxide capture facilities.
Title
Carbon Capture Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2118 (Related) 2021-06-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78.
HB4408 (Same As) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HB4408 (Same As) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1829/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1829/BILLS-117s1829is.pdf |