US SB1822 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-130. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-130. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to change the way broadband data is collected, verified, and reported. Specifically, the FCC must collect and disseminate granular broadband service availability data (broadband maps) from wired, fixed-wireless, satellite, and mobile broadband providers. To do this, the FCC is required to establish the Broadband Serviceable Location Fabric (a dataset of geocoded information for all broadband service locations, atop which broadband maps are overlaid) as the vehicle for reporting broadband service availability data. Additionally, the FCC must put forth specified requirements for service availability data collected from broadband providers, and it must create a challenge process to enable the submission of independent data challenging the accuracy of FCC broadband maps. The FCC must conduct regular audits of information submitted by providers, and it must develop a process whereby entities or individuals may submit information about the deployment and availability of broadband service to verify and supplement information submitted by providers. The FCC must also provide data collection and submission assistance to Indian tribes; small service providers; consumers; and state, local, and tribal governments. The Government Accountability Office must report on identified locations where fixed broadband can be installed to improve the quality and completeness of data sources for the fabric.
Title
Broadband DATA Act Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-130. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S.1822 by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1660) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-03 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1461-1464) |
2020-03-03 | House | H.Amdt.803 On agreeing to the Pallone amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-03 | House | H.Amdt.803 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Pallone. (consideration: CR H1461-1464; text: CR H1461-1464) |
2020-03-03 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1458-1464) |
2020-03-03 | House | Mr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2019-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 proposed by Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7180; text: CR S7215-7218) In the nature of a substitute. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7178-7180) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-174. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4229 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication