US SB1822 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Broadband DATA Act Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to change the way broadband data is collected, verified, and reported. Specifically, the FCC must collect and disseminate granular broadband service availability data (broadband maps) from wired, fixed-wireless, satellite, and mobile broadband providers. To do this, the FCC is required to establish the Broadband Serviceable Location Fabric (a dataset of geocoded information for all broadband service locations, atop which broadband maps are overlaid) as the vehicle for reporting broadband service availability data. Additionally, the FCC must put forth specified requirements for service availability data collected from broadband providers, and it must create a challenge process to enable the submission of independent data challenging the accuracy of FCC broadband maps. The Government Accountability Office must report on identified locations where fixed broadband can be installed to improve the quality and completeness of data sources for the fabric.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband DATA Act Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Sponsors

Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-19HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-12-19HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-12-19HouseReceived in the House.
2019-12-19SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateS.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateS.Amdt.1268 Amendment SA 1268 proposed by Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7180; text: CR S7215-7218) In the nature of a substitute.
2019-12-19SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-19SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7178-7180)
2019-12-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
2019-12-12SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-174.
2019-07-24SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-06-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB4229 (Related) 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 345.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback