US SB1811 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to make technical corrections to the America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to make technical corrections to the America's Water Infrastructure Act of 2018, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-07-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-11HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-11SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-10SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4776)
2019-07-10SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4776)
2019-06-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback