US SB1789 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the review of claims for benefits under laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs.
Title
PLUS for Veterans Act of 2023 Preserving Lawful Utilization of Services for Veterans Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1139 (Related) 2023-03-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB740 (Related) 2023-04-26 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-160.
HB1822 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB740 (Related) 2023-04-26 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-160.
HB1822 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1789/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1789/BILLS-118s1789is.pdf |