US SB1787 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Geologic Mapping Act Reauthorization Act This bill amends the National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992 to reauthorize the National Cooperative Geologic Mapping Program of the U.S. Geological Survey through FY2023.
Title
National Geologic Mapping Act Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-404. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 691. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4033 (Same As) 2018-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Federal officials
Geography
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Federal officials
Geography
Land use and conservation
Science, technology, communications