US SB1775 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
World War II Merchant Mariner Service Act Requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to accept additional documentation for verifying that an individual performed honorable service as a coastwise merchant seaman during the period beginning on December 7, 1941, and ending on December 31, 1946, for purposes of eligibility for veterans' benefits under the GI Bill Improvement Act of 1977. Requires such documentation to include Social Security Administration records and validated testimony in the case of the absence of Coast Guard shipping or discharge forms, ship logbooks, documents, or other official employment records. Requires DHS, when determining whether to recognize service allegedly performed during such period, to recognize masters of seagoing vessels or other command officers who were authorized to document an individual for purposes of hiring for or discharging from the merchant marine. Considers any service so recognized as active-duty service for purposes of veterans' burial benefits. Makes such veterans eligible for any appropriate military medals, ribbons, and decorations. Requires DHS to verify that an individual performed such service under honorable conditions without regard to their sex, age, or disability during the service period.
Title
World War II Merchant Mariner Service Act
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1288 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Personnel records
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Personnel records
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1775/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1775/BILLS-114s1775is.pdf |