US SB1769 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Connected Government Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires a federal agency that creates or conducts a redesign of a website that is intended for use by the public, to ensure that the website is mobile friendly. "Mobile friendly" means that the website is configured in such a way that it may be navigated, viewed, and accessed on a smartphone, tablet computer, or similar mobile device. The Office of Management and Budget and the General Services Administration must report to Congress describing the implementation of, and assessing the compliance of each agency with, such requirement.
Title
Connected Government Act
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285. |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-195. |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Related) 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication