US SB1766 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-107. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Became Public Law No: 115-107. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
SAFER Act of 2017 Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the DNA Sexual Assault Justice Act of 2004 to require the Department of Justice (DOJ), in providing information about the role of forensic nurses to certain health-related entities, to provide information about the role of both adult and pediatric forensic nurses. DOJ must also provide additional information on the need for pediatric sexual assault nurse examiners in responding to the abuse of both children and adolescents. (Sec. 3) Additionally, the bill amends the DNA Analysis Backlog Elimination Act of 2000 to reauthorize through FY2022 the requirement for DOJ to allocate a certain percentage of funds under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program for grants to audit backlogged sexual assault kits (i.e., rape kits). It extends from 2018 to 2023 the sunset date of DOJ's authority to award grants to collect DNA of arrestees and to audit backlogged rape kits.
Title
SAFER Act of 2017 Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Reporting Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-107. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10362) |
2017-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10405) |
2017-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Handel objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1766. |
2017-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10362-10364) |
2017-12-21 | House | Mrs. Handel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-10-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6717; text as passed Senate: CR S6717) |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231. |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5006) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3541 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child health
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Child health
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses