US SB1760 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs planned to be built in Oahu, Hawaii, as the "Daniel Kahikina Akaka Department of Veterans Affairs Community-Based Outpatient Clinic".
Title
A bill to designate the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs planned to be built in Oahu, Hawaii, as the "Daniel Kahikina Akaka Department of Veterans Affairs Community-Based Outpatient Clinic".
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 384 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-131. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 22, 4 Present (Roll no. 199). (text: 05/16/2022 CR H4991) |
2022-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5080) |
2022-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1760. |
2022-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4991-4994) |
2022-05-16 | House | Mr. Trone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9306) |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9306) |
2021-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3406 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.