US SB1747 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for an equitable management of summer flounder based on geographic, scientific, and economic data, and for other purposes.
Title
Fluke Fairness Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-66. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 213. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment. Without written report. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S3196-3197) |