US SB1736 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
September 11 Family Humanitarian Relief and Patriotism Act of 2009 - Provides permanent resident status adjustment for an applicant alien who: (1) was on September 10, 2001, the spouse, child, or unmarried son or daughter of an alien who died as a direct result of the September 11, 2001, terrorist activity against the United States; (2) was deemed to be a beneficiary of, and by, the September 11th Victim Compensation Fund of 2001; (3) has no federal tax liability; (4) made a proffer of information to the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) between April 24, 2008, and August 15, 2008, in connection with a request for immigration relief; and (5) applies not later than one year from the date of enactment of this Act. Makes the provisions of this Act inapplicable to an alien who is inadmissible or deportable under criminal or security grounds, including September 11, 2001, terrorist activity.
Title
September 11 Family Humanitarian Relief and Patriotism Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] | Sen. Russell Feingold [D-WI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Joseph Lieberman [I-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-01 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3290 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397.
Subjects
Crime victims
Family relationships
Foreign labor
Immigration status and procedures
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Terrorism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1736/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1736/BILLS-111s1736is.pdf |