US SB1718 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
75th Anniversary of the End of World War II Commemorative Coin Act This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 coins, 500,000 $1 coins, and 750,000 half-dollar coins in commemoration of the 75th anniversary of the end of World War II. The coins shall be emblematic of the sacrifices made by millions of people of the United States 75 years ago in bringing an end to World War II. The design on each coin shall represent the World War II Victory Medal, which was awarded to all 16 million U.S. military personnel who served from December 7, 1941, to December 31, 1946. The bill requires all sales of such coins include specified surcharges, which shall be paid by Treasury to the congressionally designated National WWII Museum to fund its educational mission of telling the story of the U.S. experience in World War II.
Title
75th Anniversary of the End of World War II Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4044 (Related) 2017-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
Conflicts and wars
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1718/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1718/BILLS-115s1718is.pdf |