US SB1694 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

One Small Step to Protect Human Heritage in Space Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

One Small Step to Protect Human Heritage in Space Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-07-19HouseReceived in the House.
2019-07-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-18SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4935)
2019-07-18SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4934)
2019-07-18SenateS.Amdt.927 Amendment SA 927 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2019-07-18SenateS.Amdt.927 Amendment SA 927 proposed by Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S4934; text: CR S4934) To modify the sense of Congress with respect to collaboration with other countries.
2019-07-18SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4934-4935)
2019-07-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 152.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
2019-07-10SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback