US SB1689 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-63. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes. This bill allows—for one year—a state to transfer amounts from its clean water state revolving fund to its drinking water state revolving fund in order to address a threat to public health as a result of heightened exposure to lead in drinking water. Specifically, a state may transfer no more than 5% of the cumulative amount of the federal grant dollars awarded for its clean water state revolving fund to its drinking water state revolving fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-63. (TXT | PDF)
2019-10-04HouseSigned by President.
2019-09-23HousePresented to President.
2019-09-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-17HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7744)
2019-09-17HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7744)
2019-09-17HouseMr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2019-09-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-09-10HouseReceived in the House.
2019-09-10SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-09SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5367; text: CR S5367)
2019-07-23SenateStar Print ordered on report 116-63.
2019-07-23SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-63.
2019-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-06-19SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback