US SB1685 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019 This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a program for the capture of carbon dioxide produced during the generation of natural gas-generated power. Specifically, DOE must identify opportunities to accelerate the development of commercially viable carbon capture technologies to reduce carbon dioxide emissions; enter into cooperative agreements with certain entities to license, permit, construct, and operate at least three facilities to capture carbon dioxide from natural gas generating power facilities; and identify any barriers to the commercial development of carbon capture technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-25SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-118.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3828 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback