US SB1678 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Became Public Law No: 116-135. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of State to annually report to Congress on steps the State Department has taken to help strengthen Taiwan's diplomatic relationships and partnerships around the world. (Taiwan is self-governing, but China considers it a renegade province and has taken actions to encourage countries and international organizations to limit or cut off relations with Taiwan.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 85 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-135. (TXT | PDF)
2020-03-26HouseSigned by President.
2020-03-16HousePresented to President.
2020-03-12HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-03-11HouseSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1678 by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-11HouseMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1710)
2020-03-05HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2020-03-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 85). (text: 03/03/2020 CR H1452-1453)
2020-03-04HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1494-1495)
2020-03-03HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-03-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1678.
2020-03-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1452-1454)
2020-03-03HouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-31HouseReceived in the House.
2019-10-30SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-10-29SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6254-6255)
2019-09-26SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
2019-09-26SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB4754 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback