US SB1678 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-09-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Internal Revenue Code provisions relating to the first-time homebuyer tax credit to: (1) extend such tax credit through May 31, 2010; (2) extend through December 31, 2009, the date until which purchases of a principal residence may be treated as made on December 31, 2008, for tax purposes; and (3) extend through May 31, 2010, the waiver of recapture requirements for residences purchased after December 31, 2008.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the first-time homebuyer tax credit, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT] |
Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Johanns [R-NE] |
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2009-09-16 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9439-9440) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3761 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Referred to House Appropriations
HB3773 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3773 (Related) 2009-10-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1678/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1678/BILLS-111s1678is.pdf |