US SB1674 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Long Island Sound Restoration and Stewardship Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to expand the duties of the Office of Management Conference of the Long Island Sound Study to include: (1) a study on environmental impacts on the Long Island Sound watershed; (2) planning initiatives for the Long Island Sound; (3) developing and implementing strategies to increase public education and awareness about the ecological health and water quality conditions of the Long Island Sound; and (4) monitoring of progress toward meeting goals, actions, and schedules of the Long Island Sound Comprehensive Conservation and Management Plan. Grants in support of the Conservation and Management Plan (other than citizen involvement and education grants) must not exceed 60% (currently 50%) of the cost of research, studies, or work. The bill revises the Offices's biennial reporting requirement with respect to the implementation of the Conservation and Management Plan and requires that reports be made available to the public. The President must submit in the President's annual budget information about the involvement of each federal department and agency in the protection and restoration of the Long Island Sound watershed, including an interagency budget for each department and agency. The Environmental Protection Agency must coordinate the actions of all federal departments and agencies that impact water quality in the Long Island Sound watershed to improve the water quality and living resources of the watershed. The bill: (1) extends the Long Island Sound Stewardship Advisory Committee through 2020, and (2) exempts the Advisory Committee from requirements of the Federal Advisory Committee Act. (Sec. 3) The bill reauthorizes through FY2020 the Office of Management Conference of the Long Island Sound Study, the Long Island Sound Stewardship Act of 2006, the Long Island Sound Grants, and the Long Island Sound Stewardship grants.
Title
Long Island Sound Restoration and Stewardship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 2848 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 2848 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 4979 to S. 2848 (Water Resources Development Act of 2016) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 114-212. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2930 (Related) 2015-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.
SB2848 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Connecticut
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection