US SB163 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act This bill directs the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to revise certain regulations regarding particulate matter emissions standards for nonemergency stationary diesel engines in remote areas of Alaska. The EPA must report on methods for assisting remote areas of Alaska in meeting specified energy needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Remote Generator Reliability and Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-05-21HouseReceived in the House.
2019-05-21SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-05-20SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2982; text: CR S2982)
2019-02-25SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-2.
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 19.
2019-02-05SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-02-05SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB422 (Same As) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback