US SB1616 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-60. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Became Public Law No: 115-60. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Bob Dole in recognition for his service to the nation as a soldier, legislator, and statesman.
Title
Bob Dole Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-60. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-09-15 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-09-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-09-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6638-6639) |
2017-09-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1616. |
2017-09-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6638-6641) |
2017-09-05 | House | Mr. Hultgren moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-08-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4804-4805) |
2017-08-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4804-4806) |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3332 (Same As) 2017-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.