US SB1614 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Became Public Law No: 113-74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Accuracy for Adoptees Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to require that a certificate of citizenship or other federal document issued, or requested to be amended, reflect the child's name and date of birth as indicated on a state court order, birth certificate, certificate of foreign birth, certificate of birth abroad, or similar state vital records document issued by the child's U.S. state of residence after the child has been adopted or readopted in that state.
Title
Accuracy for Adoptees Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-74. |
2014-01-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-12-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-12-23 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8130) |
2013-12-23 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8130) |
2013-12-23 | House | Mr. Denham asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2013-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9069) |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9069) |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3386 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.