US SB1608 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to publish a report at least every 10 years that contains physical-activity recommendations for the general public based on the most current scientific and medical knowledge, including information for population subgroups as needed. HHS must publish updated reports that detail evidence-based practices and highlight continuing physical-activity issues between the publications of full reports. Updated reports may focus on particular population subgroups or issues relating to physical activity. A federal agency that proposes to issue physical-activity recommendations that differ from the recommendations in the most recent full report must consider the recommendations in reports issued under this bill.
Title
Promoting Physical Activity for Americans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7239-7240) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2891 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Physical fitness and lifestyle