US SB1602 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses research, development, and demonstration programs relating to energy storage systems. Among other requirements, the Department of Energy must establish a research, development, and deployment program for energy storage systems, including distributed and transportation energy storage technologies and applications; enter into agreements to carry out at least five demonstration projects and develop a 10-year strategic plan for energy storage systems; establish a competitive grant program to assist certain states and tribal governments, institutions of higher education, utilities, and private energy storage companies carry out demonstration projects for pilot energy storage systems; provide technical and planning assistance to help certain electric cooperatives, political subdivisions of states, nonprofit entities, and utilities procure energy storage systems; and award competitive prizes for advancing the recycling of critical energy storage materials such as lithium and cobalt.
Title
BEST Act Better Energy Storage Technology Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 255. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 116-135. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3062-3063) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2986 (Same As) 2020-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 379.
SB2048 (Related) 2019-07-09 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB2048 (Related) 2019-07-09 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization