US SB1601 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation (DOT) to issue a final rule requiring all new passenger motor vehicles weighing less than 10,000 pounds gross vehicle weight to be equipped with a system to alert the operator to check rear designated seating positions after the vehicle engine is turned off. The alert must (1) include a distinct auditory and visual alert which may be combined with a haptic alert (i.e., vibrations), and (2) be activated when the vehicle engine is turned off. DOT must enter into an agreement with an independent third party for a study on retrofitting existing passenger motor vehicles with technology to address the problem of children left in rear seats after the vehicle engine is turned off.
Title
HOT CARS Act of 2019 Helping Overcome Trauma for Children Alone in Rear Seats Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 404. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-204. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3593 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Motor vehicles
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security