US SB1589 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Damon Paul Nelson and Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018, 2019, and 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Damon Paul Nelson and Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018, 2019, and 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateBy Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 116-47. Additional views filed.
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 97.
2019-05-22SenateSelect Committee on Intelligence. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Burr. Without written report.

Same As/Similar To

HB690 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB174 (Related) 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173.
SB245 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB314 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB838 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.
HB3476 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
HB3678 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Budget process
California
Caribbean area
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Chemical and biological weapons
China
Coal
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Cuba
Currency
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Director of National Intelligence
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Espionage and treason
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Foreign and international banking
Foreign labor
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Immigration status and procedures
Industrial facilities
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Israel
Latin America
Lebanon
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Metals
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Mining
Minority employment
National Security Agency
New York State
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Right of privacy
Russia
Sanctions
Science and engineering education
State and local government operations
Student records
Subversive activities
Syria
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Terrorism
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
World health
Yemen

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback