US SB1584 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to reauthorize the Judicial Conference of the United States to redact sensitive information contained in financial disclosure reports of judicial officers and employees, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to make permanent the authority of the Judicial Conference to redact personal and sensitive information from the financial disclosure report of a judge or judicial employee if it finds that revealing the information could endanger that individual or a family member of that individual.
Title
A bill to amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to reauthorize the Judicial Conference of the United States to redact sensitive information contained in financial disclosure reports of judicial officers and employees, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242. |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-172. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3229 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Protection of officials
Right of privacy
Supreme Court
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Protection of officials
Right of privacy
Supreme Court