US SB1576 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 707.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 707.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Prohibits any person authorized by the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to receive federal retirement payments on behalf of a minor or an individual of legal disability from embezzling or in any manner converting any amounts from such payments to a use other than for the benefit of such minor or individual. Considers any willful neglect or refusal to make and file proper accountings or reports concerning such payments as required by law to be prima facie evidence of the embezzlement or prohibited conversion of such amounts. Prohibits OPM from authorizing a person to receive payments on behalf of a minor or individual of legal disability if that person has been convicted of: (1) a violation of this Act, (2) fraud under the Social Security Act, or (3) misappropriation as a fiduciary under veterans' benefits provisions.
Title
Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 707. |
2016-12-30 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2016-07-21 | House | Referred sequentially to the House Committee on the Judiciary for a period ending not later than Dec. 31, 2016 for consideration of such provisions of the bill as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(I) of rule X. |
2016-07-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-695, Part I. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-09-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6423-6424; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6423-6424; text as passed Senate: CR S6424) |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 167. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 114-95. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics