US SB1563 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act
Title
Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-255. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2803 (Related) 2018-11-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Coal
Congressional oversight
Energy
Government studies and investigations
Metals
Strategic materials and reserves
Technology assessment
Coal
Congressional oversight
Energy
Government studies and investigations
Metals
Strategic materials and reserves
Technology assessment