US SB1562 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - S.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Foreign Influence Reporting in Elections Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreign Influence Reporting in Elections Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateS.Amdt.845 Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
2019-05-21SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB3873 (Related) 2019-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2242 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback