US SB1557 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing, Transportation, and Community Development. Hearings held.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-16 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing, Transportation, and Community Development. Hearings held.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reform the low-income housing credit, and for other purposes.
Title
Affordable Housing Credit Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Katie Boyd Britt [R-AL] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Laphonza Butler [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing, Transportation, and Community Development. Hearings held. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3238 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB10009 (Related) 2024-10-18 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB10009 (Related) 2024-10-18 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Accountability, Energy and Commerce, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/1557/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s1557/BILLS-118s1557is.pdf |