US SB1529 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes jurisdiction over certain Iranian assets so that judgments against Iran for the 1983 bombing of the U.S. Marine barracks in Beirut, Lebanon, may be collected by the victims' families. Specifically, the bill establishes personal jurisdiction for the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York over Iranian funds held outside the United States by any foreign securities intermediary.
Title
Supporting Victims of Iranian Terrorism Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2790 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime victims
Federal district courts
Foreign property
Government liability
International affairs
Iran
Jurisdiction and venue
Lebanon
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
New York City
Sanctions
Securities
Terrorism
Crime victims
Federal district courts
Foreign property
Government liability
International affairs
Iran
Jurisdiction and venue
Lebanon
Middle East
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
New York City
Sanctions
Securities
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1529/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1529/BILLS-116s1529is.pdf |